Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Sonya Ledford, filed a(n) case represented by Lari, Younes, against Asm Global Enterprises, Inc., Smg Property Management, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with DEES, ROBERT M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2023 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
This complaint is filed by Sonya Ledford against SMG Property Management, Inc. and ASM Global Enterprises, Inc. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of both defendants in maintaining the premises of Vystar Veterans Memorial Arena in Jacksonvi...
CASE FEES PAID: $20.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4409334
Date: May 22, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO ASM GLOBAL ENTERPRISES, INC.
Date: May 22, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO SMG PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC.
Date: May 22, 2023AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES
Date: May 15, 2023ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES
Date: April 05, 2023CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4369548
Date: March 23, 2023COVER SHEET
Date: March 23, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 06/21/2023 12:30PM CORPORATE SERVICE, SMG PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON ASM GLOBAL ENTERPRISES INC ON 6/5/23 AT 5:15PM | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $20.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4409334 | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO ASM GLOBAL ENTERPRISES, INC. | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO SMG PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC. | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4369548 | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.