Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Iris Hunt-Vazquez, filed a(n) case represented by Conner, Tara Beth, against Constance Barrett, Donald Barrett, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with DEARING, KATIE L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2023 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
This complaint is filed by Iris Hunt-Vazquez against Donald Barrett and Constance Barrett. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of Donald Barrett, who allegedly caused a collision with Iris Hunt-Vazquez's vehicle. The complaint also holds Con...
CASE FEES PAID: $20.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4419111
Date: June 08, 2023REQUEST (PLTF) TO SCHEDULE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION
Date: June 06, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED FOR CONSTANCE BARRETT
Date: June 06, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED DONALD BARRETT
Date: June 06, 2023ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES
Date: April 05, 2023AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES
Date: May 15, 2023CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4369513
Date: March 28, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 23, 2023COVER SHEET
Date: March 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION (PLTFS.) TO EXTEND THE TIME WITHIN WHICH TO PERFECT SERVICE UPON DEFTS. | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (PLAINTIFF'S) WITHIN WHICH TO PERFECT SERVICE UPON DEFENDANTS | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $20.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4419111 | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST (PLTF) TO SCHEDULE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS -PLTF | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED FOR CONSTANCE BARRETT | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED DONALD BARRETT | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4369513 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.