Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Terry Brock, filed a(n) case represented by Frisbie, Joshua Harrison, Holzberg, Glenn Jay, against Jane Doe, Miss Becky Seafood Inc., Miss Becky'S Seafood, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with WALLACE, III, WADDELL A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2023 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
This complaint is filed by Terry Brock against Miss Becky's Seafood, Inc. and Jane Doe in the Circuit Court of the 4th Judicial Circuit in Duval County, Florida. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of the defendants, claiming that they faile...
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL GLENN HOLZBERG FOR TERRY BROCK
Date: August 01, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (PLAINTIFF'S) TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY
Date: July 31, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO MISS BECKY SEAFOOD INC.
Date: May 24, 2023MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLTF MODIFICATION
Date: June 30, 2023NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES (DEFT'S)
Date: June 30, 2023REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S)
Date: June 30, 2023ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (DEFT'S)
Date: June 30, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL JOSHUA FRISBIE FOR TERRY BROCK
Date: May 24, 2023CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4411402
Date: May 24, 2023AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES
Date: May 15, 2023AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: May 24, 2023ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES
Date: March 28, 2023CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4368931
Date: March 28, 2023COVER SHEET
Date: March 23, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL GLENN HOLZBERG FOR TERRY BROCK | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (PLAINTIFF'S) TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLTF MODIFICATION | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES (DEFT'S) | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S) | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (DEFT'S) | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON MISS BECKY SEAFOOD, INC. C/O GERALD L PACK ON 06/10/2023 AT 02:43 PM BY REBECCA PACK, AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO MISS BECKY SEAFOOD INC. | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL JOSHUA FRISBIE FOR TERRY BROCK | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4411402 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.