Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Phyllis Coleman, filed a(n) case represented by Shanteau, Douglas William, against City Of Jacksonville, represented by Macgillis, Shannon Alison, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with FELTEL JR, GILBERT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2023 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
This complaint is filed by Phyllis Coleman against the City of Jacksonville. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of the defendant, resulting in injuries to the plaintiff. The incident occurred on November 8, 2022, at the Bradham and Brooks B...
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFT COJ)
Date: July 20, 2023NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: August 17, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL SHANNON MACGILLIS FOR CITY OF JACKSONVILLE
Date: July 20, 2023CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4423556
Date: June 14, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED CITY OF JACKSONVILLE ATTN; LENNY CURRY MAYOR OF JACKSONVILLE
Date: June 13, 2023AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES
Date: May 15, 2023ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES
Date: March 28, 2023CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4368785
Date: March 28, 2023COVER SHEET
Date: March 23, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFT COJ) | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL SHANNON MACGILLIS FOR CITY OF JACKSONVILLE | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4423556 | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED CITY OF JACKSONVILLE ATTN; LENNY CURRY MAYOR OF JACKSONVILLE | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4368785 | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.