Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Vanessa Singleton, filed a(n) case represented by Wolf, David Alan, against Direct General Insurance Company, Kevin K Lewis, Zereeda V Lewis, represented by Mcfarlane, William John Iii, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with NORTON, VIRGINIA B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2023 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
This complaint is filed by Vanessa Singleton against Zereeda V. Lewis, Kevin K. Lewis, and Direct General Insurance Company. Vanessa Singleton alleges that on February 19, 2023, Zereeda V. Lewis negligently operated a Chrysler 300, which collided wit...
SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 06/26/2023 08:00AM PERSONAL, ZEREEDA LEWIS
Date: June 30, 2023CASE FEES PAID: $30.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4428369
Date: June 15, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED FOR ZEREEDA V. LEWIS
Date: June 15, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED FOR KEVIN K. LEWIS
Date: June 15, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED FOR DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: June 15, 2023AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES
Date: May 15, 2023ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES
Date: March 28, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 23, 2023CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4368748
Date: March 28, 2023COVER SHEET
Date: March 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DEFT'S DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY) TO RESPOND TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL WILLIAM MCFARLANE III FOR DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 06/23/2023 02:39PM SERVE, DIRECT GENERAL INS CO | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 06/26/2023 08:00AM PERSONAL, ZEREEDA LEWIS | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 06/26/2023 08:00AM SUBSTITUTE, ZEREEDA B LEWIS FOR KEVIN K LEWIS | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $30.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4428369 | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED FOR ZEREEDA V. LEWIS | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED FOR KEVIN K. LEWIS | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED FOR DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.