Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Daria Kostin, Robert Anderson, Valentyna Anderson, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Dunnavant, Erin E, against Olympus Insurance, represented by Ferry, Katelyn Mae, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with FELTEL JR, GILBERT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 15, 2023 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / NONAVAILABILITY (DEFTS) FROM 12/25/2023-1/5/2023
Date: September 14, 2023ORDER GRANTING MOTION / DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: September 11, 2023MOTION (DEFENDANT'S) FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES 57.105
Date: August 08, 2023RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFTS) TO PLTFS FIRST
Date: July 05, 2023PRIVILEGE LOG (DEFTS)
Date: July 05, 2023RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFTS) TO PLTFS FIRST
Date: July 05, 2023NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (DEFTS) TO PLTFS FIRST SET
Date: July 05, 2023ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: May 10, 2023MOTION (DEFT) FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: May 17, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DEFTS') TO RESPOND TO PLTFS' DISCOVERY
Date: May 05, 2023AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES
Date: May 08, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL KATELYN FERRY FOR OLYMPUS INSURANCE
Date: April 10, 2023ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES
Date: March 17, 2023CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4356881
Date: March 17, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED - OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: March 15, 2023REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT., FILED BY PLTF.
Date: March 15, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT.
Date: March 15, 2023REQUEST TO PRODUCE OF DOCUMENTS FILED BY PLTF.
Date: March 15, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 15, 2023COVER SHEET
Date: March 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / NONAVAILABILITY (DEFTS) FROM 12/25/2023-1/5/2023 | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION / DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DEFT'S) WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH FLA STAT 627.70152 | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING (PLTF'S) SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF PLTF'S OBJECTION AND RESPONSE TO DEFT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION (DEFENDANT'S) FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES 57.105 | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING (DEFT'S) ON AUG 23, 2023 AT 3:30PM, VIA ZOOM. MOTION TO DISMISS | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | REPLY (DEFTS) TO PLTFS OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSE TO DEFTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFTS) TO PLTFS FIRST | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | PRIVILEGE LOG (DEFTS) | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFTS) TO PLTFS FIRST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.