Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Financial Pacific Leasing, Inc., filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Toland, Howard Steven, against Kelco Recycling Inc, Michael J Kelcourse Jr, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with NORTON, VIRGINIA B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 13, 2023 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
DECLARATION (PLTF'S VERIFIED) PURSUANT TO FLA STAT 92.525(2) IN SUPPORT OF COSTS
Date: September 18, 2023DECLARATION (PLTF'S VERIFIED) PURSUANT TO FLA STAT 92.525(2) IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT
Date: September 18, 2023DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST KELCO RECYCLING, INC
Date: June 06, 2023NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 02, 2023MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT /DEFAULT - PLTF
Date: September 18, 2023DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST MICHAEL JAMES KELCOURSE, JR
Date: June 06, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO MICHAEL JAMES KELCOURSE, JR
Date: March 13, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST MICHAEL JAMES KELCOURSE, JR
Date: June 02, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST KELCO RECYCLING, INC
Date: June 02, 2023AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES
Date: May 08, 2023ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES
Date: March 15, 2023CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4354495
Date: March 15, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 13, 2023COVER SHEET
Date: March 13, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO KELCO RECYCLING, INC.
Date: March 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION (PLTF'S VERIFIED) PURSUANT TO FLA STAT 92.525(2) IN SUPPORT OF COSTS | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION (PLTF'S VERIFIED) PURSUANT TO FLA STAT 92.525(2) IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT /DEFAULT - PLTF | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST KELCO RECYCLING, INC | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST MICHAEL JAMES KELCOURSE, JR | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST MICHAEL JAMES KELCOURSE, JR | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST KELCO RECYCLING, INC | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 04/13/2023 07:50PM PERSONAL, MICHAEL J KELCOURSE JR | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 04/13/2023 10:15AM SERVED CORPORATEIION, KALCO RECYCLING, INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.