Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Capital One, N.A., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Spinozza, Kevin John, against John S Kim, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts County Civil with MORAN, AUDREY MCKIBBIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 20, 2022 |
CategoryComplaint On Contract Or Other Debt - $501 - $2,500 Division: Cc-B |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCounty Civil |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR JOHN S KIM
Date: February 02, 2023CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4318531
Date: January 24, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED (ALIAS) JOHN S KIM
Date: January 24, 2023SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (ALIAS) JOHN S KIM - PLAINTIFF
Date: January 23, 2023NOTICE -PLAINTIFF
Date: January 19, 2023SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED TO JOHN S KIM
Date: December 04, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED JOHN S KIM
Date: October 22, 2022MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER (PLAINTIFF'S)
Date: November 17, 2022CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4262568
Date: October 22, 2022SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED JOHN S KIM -PLAINTIFF
Date: October 20, 2022NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR JOHN S KIM -PLAINTIFF
Date: October 20, 2022COVER SHEET
Date: October 20, 2022STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: October 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | > CANCEL REASON - PLAINTIFF UNABLE TO PERFECT SERVICE | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 3/9/2023 1:30:00 PM | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR JOHN S KIM | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4318531 | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED (ALIAS) JOHN S KIM | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/09/2023 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202 | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (ALIAS) JOHN S KIM - PLAINTIFF | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE -PLAINTIFF | |
December 04, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED TO JOHN S KIM | |
December 04, 2022 | Docket Event | > CANCEL REASON - UNABLE TO PERFECT SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.