Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Resurgent Receivables Llc, filed a(n) case represented by Piliuiko, Oleksandra, against Darrik Frazier, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts County Civil with LANIGAN, ROBIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCounty Civil |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: May 25, 2023NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: May 25, 2023MOTION TO ADOPT SETTLEMENT STIPULATION -PLAINTIFF
Date: October 07, 2022ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSAL
Date: November 01, 2022CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4232472
Date: September 08, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED DARRIK FRAZIER
Date: September 08, 2022SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED DARRIK FRAZIER -PLAINTIFF
Date: September 08, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: September 08, 2022COVER SHEET
Date: September 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSAL | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 10/20/2022 1:30:00 PM | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | > CANCEL REASON - STIPULATION | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO ADOPT SETTLEMENT STIPULATION -PLAINTIFF | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 9-19-22 AT 12:28 P.M., (SUBSTITUTE) ON ERIN HENDERSON, FOR DARRIK FRAZIER | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4232472 | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED DARRIK FRAZIER | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 10/20/2022 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.