Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
First Portfolio Ventures I, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Blacher, Jeffrey W, against Aleatha Donaldson, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts County Civil with PEOPLES-WATERS, RHONDA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2022 |
CategoryComplaint On Contract Or Other Debt - $501 - $2,500 Division: Cc-D |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCounty Civil |
SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT NO RETURN OF SERVICE ON FILE
Date: March 09, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED (PLURIES) ALEATHA DONALDSON
Date: January 23, 2023CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4318094
Date: January 23, 2023SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (PLURIES) ALEATHA DONALDSON
Date: January 23, 2023NOTICE -PLAINTIFF
Date: January 19, 2023SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR AQUALLA STEPHEN
Date: January 11, 2023ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER /PLAINTIFF'S
Date: January 10, 2023MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER - PLAINTIFF'S
Date: December 19, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED (ALIAS) ALEATHA DONALDSON
Date: December 14, 2022CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4295154
Date: December 13, 2022SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (ALIAS) ALEATHA DONALDSON -PLAINTIFF
Date: December 13, 2022SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR ALEATHA DONALDSON
Date: October 18, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED ALEATHA DONALDSON
Date: September 08, 2022CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4232454
Date: September 08, 2022SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ALEATHA DONALDSON -PLAINTIFF
Date: September 08, 2022NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS -PLAINTIFF
Date: September 08, 2022STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: September 08, 2022COVER SHEET
Date: September 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 03/07/2023 08:59PM, ALEATHA DONALDSON, SUBSTITUTED TO JOHN DOE (CO-OCCUPANT) | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT NO RETURN OF SERVICE ON FILE | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED (PLURIES) ALEATHA DONALDSON | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4318094 | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/09/2023 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202 | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (PLURIES) ALEATHA DONALDSON | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE -PLAINTIFF | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | > CANCEL REASON - PLAINTIFF UNABLE TO PERFECT SERVICE | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 2/2/2023 1:30:00 PM | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR AQUALLA STEPHEN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.