Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Vystar Credit Union, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jimerson, Charles B, Pontieri, Theresa Carli, against Kenta N Azar, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts County Civil with FERGUSON, III, EMMET F. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 19, 2022 |
CategoryComplaint On Contract Or Other Debt - $15000 - $30000 Division: Cc-A |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCounty Civil |
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL WITHIN LAW FIRM AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: April 25, 2023ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT KEAT AZAR
Date: November 08, 2022NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT KENTA N. AZAR - PLAINTIFF
Date: October 31, 2022CASE FEES PAID: $410.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4261527
Date: October 20, 2022REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( PLAINTIFF'S ) TO DEFENDANT
Date: October 19, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( PLAINTIFF'S FIRST ) TO DEFENDANT
Date: October 19, 2022REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( PLAINTIFF'S ) TO DEFENDANT
Date: October 19, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED DEFT. KENTA N. AZAR
Date: October 19, 2022COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: October 19, 2022COVER SHEET
Date: October 19, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL CHARLES JIMERSON FOR VYSTAR CREDIT UNION WITHIN LAW FIRM AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL WITHIN LAW FIRM AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT KEAT AZAR | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 10/26/22 @ 9:35AM TO KENTA N. AZAR, SUBSTITUTE, ACREE AZAR, CO-RESIDENT/HUSBAND - PLAINTIFF | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT KENTA N. AZAR - PLAINTIFF | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $410.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4261527 | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( PLAINTIFF'S ) TO DEFENDANT | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( PLAINTIFF'S FIRST ) TO DEFENDANT | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( PLAINTIFF'S ) TO DEFENDANT | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED DEFT. KENTA N. AZAR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.