Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by De Jesus, John Bacus, against Sean Pamhile, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts County Civil with MORAN, AUDREY MCKIBBIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 11, 2022 |
CategoryComplaint On Contract Or Other Debt - $8000 - $15000 Division: Cc-B |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCounty Civil |
UNABLE TO ISSUE DEFAULT - ANSWER FILED AN ANSWER ON 12/16/2022
Date: December 22, 2022ANSWER FILED BY SEAN PAMPHILE (MAILED)
Date: December 16, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED FOR SEAN PAMHILE
Date: October 11, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST SEAN PAMHILE OTHER
Date: December 19, 2022CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4254922
Date: October 12, 2022SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 10/31/22 @ 4:52PM TO SEAN PAMHILE, PERSONAL - PLAINTIFF
Date: November 01, 2022COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: October 11, 2022COVER SHEET
Date: October 11, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | UNABLE TO ISSUE DEFAULT - ANSWER FILED AN ANSWER ON 12/16/2022 | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST SEAN PAMHILE OTHER | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY SEAN PAMPHILE (MAILED) | |
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 10/31/22 @ 4:52PM TO SEAN PAMHILE, PERSONAL - PLAINTIFF | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4254922 | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED FOR SEAN PAMHILE | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $8000 - $15000 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.