Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
State Farm Florida Ins Co Aso Bruce Rowan, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Beckham, Eugene Goff, against Northeast Roofers, Inc, Roofcrafters Roofing, Llc, represented by Fernandez, Ellis T Iii, Kahn, Gregory Jay, Thompson, Jeff Mark, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with FELTEL JR, GILBERT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2022 |
CategoryOther Negligence - Other Division: Cv-H |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
This complaint is filed by State Farm Florida Insurance Company on behalf of Bruce Rowan against Roofcrafters Roofing, L.L.C. and Northeast Roofers, Inc. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of both defendants in their roofing work on the ins...
REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT ROOFCRAFTERS ROOFING'S FIRST) TO PLTF
Date: July 26, 2023MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL (PLAINTIFF'S) JURY
Date: July 21, 2023STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL -DEFT
Date: July 20, 2023MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S) FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 14, 2023NOTICE OF FILING OBJECTIONS TO INTERROGATORIES - PLTF
Date: July 14, 2023RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE , NORTHEAST ROOFERS INC
Date: July 14, 2023NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES - PLTF
Date: July 14, 2023REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES -PLAINTIFF
Date: April 04, 2023REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES -PLAINTIFF
Date: April 03, 2023ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFTS NORTHEAST ROOFING INCS) TO PLTFS COMPLAINT
Date: March 31, 2023CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4295708
Date: December 15, 2022NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS
Date: March 31, 2023ORDER GRANTING DEFT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSTION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT
Date: February 08, 2023NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS -DEFT
Date: February 06, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ELLIS FERNANDEZ III FOR ROOFCRAFTERS ROOFING, LLC
Date: February 06, 2023NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS -DEFENDANT'S
Date: February 03, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO ROOFCRAFTER ROOFING, LLC
Date: December 14, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: December 14, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO NORTHEAST ROOFERS, INC.
Date: December 14, 2022COVER SHEET
Date: December 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | OBJECTION (DEFENDANT, NORTHEAST ROOFERS, INC.'S) TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET JURY TRIAL AND REQUEST FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT ROOFCRAFTERS ROOFING'S FIRST) TO PLTF | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFT ROOFCRAFTER ROOFING LLC) FIRST TO DEFT NORTHEAST ROOFERS INC | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFT ROOFCRAFTERS ROOFING LLC) FIRST TO PLTF | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL (PLAINTIFF'S) JURY | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL -DEFT | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S) FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING OBJECTIONS TO INTERROGATORIES - PLTF | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE , NORTHEAST ROOFERS INC | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES - PLTF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.