Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Taylor Christy Boyd, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lafountain, Nicholas A, O'Connor, Ryan Nicholas, against Stephanie Ann Sterling, represented by Fresco, Eric Michael, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with Anderson Jr, Bruce R presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence Case Division: Cv-E |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Taylor Christy Boyd against Stephanie Ann Sterling in the Circuit Court of the Fourth Judicial Circuit in Duval County, Florida. The complaint alleges that Stephanie Ann Sterling was negligent in a motor ve...
ORDER (AGREED) ON DEFT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: June 07, 2023NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ON 06/05/2023 @350PM
Date: June 05, 2023ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/22/23 @ 10:30AM VIA ZOOM
Date: August 09, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING 6/5/23 @ 3:50 PM VIA ZOOM
Date: June 02, 2023ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFTS)
Date: June 05, 2023INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT'S) AND NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 01, 2023REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S)
Date: June 01, 2023NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT -PLTF
Date: May 15, 2023REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S) AND NOTICE OF SERVICE
Date: June 01, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING 06/05/2023 3:50 PM VIA ZOOM
Date: May 17, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE TO STEPHANIE ANN STERLING ON JAN 24, 2023 AT 03:11 PM
Date: May 03, 2023CASE FEES PAID: $5.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4313949
Date: January 12, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (PLAINTIFF'S) TO PERFECT SERVICE
Date: January 20, 2023ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE
Date: January 23, 2023SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON STEPHANIE ANN STERLING ON DECEMBER 19, 2022 AT 12:47 P.M.
Date: January 09, 2023CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4309920
Date: January 09, 2023ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO STEPHANIE ANN STERLING
Date: January 05, 2023SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON STEPHANIE ANN STERLING ON OCTOBER 13, 2022 AT 10:45 AM
Date: January 09, 2023STANDING ORDER ON POLICIES AND PROCEDURES
Date: December 22, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT., STEPHANIE ANN STERLING - PLTF
Date: September 30, 2022CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4248674
Date: September 30, 2022COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: September 30, 2022REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) TO DEFT., STEPHANIE ANN STERLING - PLTF
Date: September 30, 2022COVER SHEET
Date: September 30, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO STEPHANIE ANN STERLING
Date: September 30, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/22/23 @ 10:30AM VIA ZOOM | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER (AGREED) ON DEFT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ON 06/05/2023 @350PM | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFTS) | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 6/5/23 @ 3:50 PM VIA ZOOM | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT'S) AND NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S) | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S) AND NOTICE OF SERVICE | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 06/05/2023 3:50 PM VIA ZOOM | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT -PLTF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.