Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ann Pearson, Sam Pearson, filed a(n) case represented by Geary, Julie Marie, Grichener, Ulyana Yuryevna, Weisser, Kevin Joshua, against State Farm Florida Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with NORTON, VIRGINIA B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Ann Pearson and Sam Pearson against State Farm Florida Insurance Company. The complaint alleges that there was a property insurance policy in effect, and the plaintiffs' property located at 1655 Hammock Gro...
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF SAM PEARSON ON 4/20/23 AT 1:00PM
Date: April 20, 2023NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF ANN PEARSON ON 4/20/23 AT 10:00AM
Date: April 20, 2023ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (AGREED) TO RESPOND TO DEFT DISCOVERY
Date: February 13, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (PLAINTIFF'S)
Date: February 09, 2023NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: February 09, 2023REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES -PLTF
Date: January 23, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR DEFT COUNSEL
Date: January 13, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF ANN PEARSON AND SAM PEARSON
Date: January 11, 2023REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S FIRST) TO PLAINTIFFS ANN PEARSON AND SAM PEARSON
Date: January 11, 2023RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY)
Date: January 11, 2023RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY)
Date: January 11, 2023AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: December 21, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ON SAM PEARSON ON 04/20/2023 @100PM VIA ZOOM
Date: December 20, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JULIE GEARY FOR ANN PEARSON AND SAM PEARSON JOINT
Date: November 14, 2022NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS -DEFT
Date: October 19, 2022CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4237721
Date: September 15, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE
Date: September 08, 2022REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTFS)
Date: September 08, 2022REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTFS)
Date: September 08, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTFS)
Date: September 08, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF COR REP 01/23/2023 @1000AM FORT LAUDERDALE, FL
Date: September 08, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: September 08, 2022COVER SHEET
Date: September 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF SAM PEARSON ON 4/20/23 AT 1:00PM | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF ANN PEARSON ON 4/20/23 AT 10:00AM | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ULYANA GRICHENER FOR ANN PEARSON AND SAM PEARSON AND ELECTRONIC MAIL DESIGNATION | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (AGREED) TO RESPOND TO DEFT DISCOVERY | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (PLAINTIFF'S) | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES -PLTF | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR DEFT COUNSEL | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF ANN PEARSON AND SAM PEARSON | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S FIRST) TO PLAINTIFFS ANN PEARSON AND SAM PEARSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.