Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
16-2020-CP-000968-XXXX-MA
A case was filed in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL. Judge SCHEMER, JACK M. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 30, 2020
Last Refreshed
August 21, 2023
Filing Location
Duval County, FL
Filing Court House
Probate
Status
Closed
Parties
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 03/10/2022 10:15 AM - 0 NO COURT ROOM ENTERED | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF ALLOCATION OF RECOVERY | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | INVENTORY | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO CREDITORS | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION - MARCH 24 31 2021 | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $6.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3839967 | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE BOOK 19640 PAGE 995-995 | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION BOOK 19635 PAGE 703-703 | |
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER,CONSENT,WAIVER & BOND | |
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED PETITION FOR ADMINSITRATON - INTESTATE | |
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE | |
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event | FORMAL NOTICE BY MAIL | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | WAIVER,CONSENT,WAIVER & BOND | |
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT - SPECIAL POWER OF ATTORNEY | |
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM -BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER DOWNTOWN $122.13 | |
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | OATH AND DESIGNATION | |
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | FORMAL ADMINISTRATION | |
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT | |
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION-INTESTATE-FL MODIFICATION | |
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING | |
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | WAIVER BY BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE | |
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DEATH | |
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3659171 |