Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Jill Earlene Gardner filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Probate with SCHEMER, JACK M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 07, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseProbate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER AUTHORIZING SALE BOOK 19751 PAGE 2241-2242 | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR SALE | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION AND RELEASE OF CLAIM -LIBERTY AMBULANCE SERVICE INC | |
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION AND RELEASE OF CLAIM -BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER BEACHES | |
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM -LIBERTY AMBULANCE SERVICE INC $460.00 | |
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | INVENTORY | |
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM -BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER BEACHES $1,968.00 | |
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $3.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3664592 | |
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST -1 CC | |
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.