Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hh Canopy Creek For Canopy Creek, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Westling, Dale Gregory, against Ondria Brown, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts County Civil with ECKLEY-MOULDER, KELLY E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2020 |
CategoryEviction/Distress For Rent - Or Removal Of Tenant (Non-Monetary) Division: Cc-H |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseCounty Civil |
COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF HH CANOPY CREEK FOR CANOPY CREEK = DEFENDANT ONDRIA BROWN
Date: December 31, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT ORDER AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING FILE | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING DEFENDANT'S CDC DECLARATION -FILED BY PLTF | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF PAYMENTS (JOINT) | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL-UNDELIVERABLE REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE ADDITIONAL INFORMATION (FCA & CDC AFFIDAVIT | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF REGARDING CDC ORDER | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE ADDITIONAL INFORMATION (CDC AFFIDAVIT) | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 01/05/2021 04:05PM SERVE, ONDRIA BROWN | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF REGARDING FEDERAL CARES ACT | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH FEDERAL LAW | |
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF HH CANOPY CREEK FOR CANOPY CREEK = DEFENDANT ONDRIA BROWN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.