Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
S2 Residential As Manager For Shore House Apts, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Westling, Dale Gregory, against Audrianna Nelson, Christopher Mason, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts County Civil with PERRY, ERIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2020 |
CategoryEviction/Distress For Rent - Or Removal Of Tenant (Residential) (Non-Monetary) Division: Cc-D |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseCounty Civil |
CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFENDANT CHRISTOPHER MASON
Date: December 31, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED 3-2-2021 @ 10:57AM | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3810306 | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 19568 PAGE 607-607 | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF REGARDING CDC ORDER | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFAULT AS TO AUDRIANNA NELSON AND CHRISTOPHER MASON | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT/WRIT OF POSS/MIL AFF/PROOF OF CLAIM AGAINST AUDRIANNA NELSON AND CHRISTOPHER MASON | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 01/07/2021 04:10PM POSTED, AUDRIANNA NELSON | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 01/07/2021 04:10PM POSTED, CHRISTOPHER MASON | |
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFENDANT CHRISTOPHER MASON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.