Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
S2 Residential For Shore House Apts, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Westling, Dale Gregory, against Taylor Shirk, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts County Civil with MITCHELL, SCOTT F. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2020 |
CategoryEviction/Distress For Rent - Or Removal Of Tenant (Residential) (Non-Monetary) Division: Cc-G |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseCounty Civil |
CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFENDANT
Date: December 31, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF MAILED SUMMONS & COMPLAINT RETURNED NOT DELIVERED TAYLOR SHIRK | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3804421 | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED | |
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION BOOK 19560 PAGE 2106-2106 | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE ADDITIONAL INFORMATION (CDC AFFIDAVIT) | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF REGARDING CDC ORDER | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFAULT AS TO TAYLOR SHIRK | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT/WRIT OF POSS/MIL AFF/PROOF OF CLAIM AGAINST TAYLOR SHIRK | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 01/07/2021 03:40PM POSTED, TAYLOR SHIRK | |
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFENDANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.