Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
S2 Residential As Manager For Shore House Apts, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Westling, Dale Gregory, against Natasha Turner, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts County Civil with FERGUSON, III, EMMET F. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2020 |
CategoryEviction/Distress For Rent - Or Removal Of Tenant (Residential) (Non-Monetary) Division: Cc-A |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseCounty Civil |
CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFENDANT NATASHA TURNER
Date: December 31, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION BOOK 19563 PAGE 477-477 | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF REGARDING CDC ORDER | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFAULT AS TO NATASHA TURNER | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT/WRIT OF POSS/MIL AFF/PROOF OF CLAIM AGAINST NATASHA TURNER | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 01/07/2021 04:00PM POSTED, NATASHA TURNER | |
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFENDANT NATASHA TURNER | |
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NATASHA TURNER | |
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED NATASHA TURNER | |
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT | |
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.