Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Weichert Realtors The Coffey Group, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Westling, Dale Gregory, against Torano Givens, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts County Civil with ECKLEY-MOULDER, KELLY E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2020 |
CategoryEviction/Distress For Rent - Or Removal Of Tenant (Non-Monetary) Division: Cc-H |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseCounty Civil |
COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF WEICHERT REALTORS THE COFFEY GROUP = DEFENDANT TORANO GIVENS
Date: December 31, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED 3-8-2021 @ 02:49PM | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3815409 | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 19583 PAGE 1753-1753 | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF RENT INTO REGISTRY OF COURT | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF REGARDING CDC ORDER | |
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE ADDITIONAL INFORMATION (CDC AFFIDAVIT) | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | UNABLE TO ISSUE DEFAULT (ANSWER FILED BY DEFT., 1-13-2021) | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT/WRIT OF POSS/MIL AFF/PROOF OF CLAIM AGAINST TORANO GIVENS | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER FROM DEFT., TORANO GIVENS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.