Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Westside Rental, Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Westling, Dale Gregory, against James Riley, Tyliesha Hilton, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts County Civil with PERRY, ERIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2020 |
CategoryEviction/Distress For Rent - Or Removal Of Tenant (Non-Monetary) Division: Cc-D |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseCounty Civil |
CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFENDANT JAMES RILEY
Date: December 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER FILED BY TRANSUNION | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION BOOK 19599 PAGE 1359-1359 | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFAULT AS TO JAMES RILEY AND TY'LIESHA HILTON | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT/WRIT OF POSS/MIL AFF/PROOF OF CLAIM AGAINST JAMES RILE AND TY'LIESHA HILTON | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 01/07/2021 09:10AM POSTED, TY LIESHA HILTON | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 01/07/2021 09:10AM POSTED, JAMES RILEY | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF REGARDING CDC ORDER | |
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY) | |
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF WESTSIDE RENTAL, LLC = DEFENDANT JAMES RILEY AND TYLIESHA HILTON | |
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED DEFENDANT JAMES RILEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.