Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
S2 Jax 1 Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Barron, James Ivy Iii, against Shaquir Lampkins, Samantha Boswell, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts County Civil with LANIGAN, ROBIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 20, 2020 |
CategoryEviction/Distress For Rent - Or Removal Of Tenant (Non-Monetary) Division: Cc-I |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseCounty Civil |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AGAINST DEFENDANT SAMANTHA BOSWELL
Date: October 20, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER (SECOND) REUIRING PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE ADDITIONAL INFORMATION (FCA AND CDC AFFIDAVIT) | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL-UNDELIVERABLE REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE ADDITIONAL INFORMATION (FCA AND CDC AFFIDAVIT) | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE ADDITIONAL INFORMATION (FCA AND CDC AFFIDAVIT) | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST SAMANTHA BOSWELL AND SHAQUIR LAMPKINS | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT - SAMANTHA BOSWELL AND SHAQUIR LAMPKINS | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST SAMANTHA BOSWELL AND SHAQUIR LAMPKINS | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFAULT AS TO SAMANTHA BOSWELL AND SHAQUIR LAMPKINS | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON SHAQUIR LAMPKINS ON 11-3-2020@10:05AM,POSTED | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON SAMANTHA BOSWELL ON 11-3-2020@10:06AM,POSTED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.