Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rhonda Lowe, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Julie Monahan, Andy Cruz, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts County Civil with MORAN, JOHN A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 08, 2020 |
CategoryEviction/Distress For Rent - Or Removal Of Tenant (Non-Monetary) Division: Cc-E |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseCounty Civil |
SUMMONS ISSUED JULIE MONAHAN
Date: October 08, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED ON 02/12/2021 @ 11:05AM | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3804908 | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 19563 PAGE 448-449 | |
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AGAINST DEFENDANTS JULIE MONAHAN | |
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT ANDY CRUZ | |
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST DEFENDANT JULIE MONAHAN | |
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST DEFENDANT ANDY CRUZ | |
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AGAINST DEFENDANT ANDY CRUZ | |
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDAT ANDY CRUZ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.