Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wilmington Trust, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Belmudez, Sean Paul, Mclain, Robert A, against Kenneth Knight, Unknown Spouse Of Kenneth Knight A K A Kenneth A. Knight, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2020 |
CategoryNon-Homestead Residential Foreclosure $0 - $50,000 Division: Fc-F |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Successor Trustee to Citibank, N.A. as Trustee for Bear Stearns Second Lien Trust 2007-SV1, Mortgage-Backed Certificates, Series 2007-SV1 (referred to as "Plai...
FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO -REMARKS: NOV
Date: February 10, 2021CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3773491
Date: February 09, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19577 PAGE 1639-1640
Date: February 05, 2021FINAL DISPOSITION FORM ; DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING - PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT
Date: February 05, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL SEAN BELMUDEZ FOR WILMINGTON TRUST
Date: January 12, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME -KENNETH KNIGHT
Date: January 04, 2021NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY -UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KENNETH KNIGHT
Date: January 06, 2021ANSWER -KENNETH KNIGHT
Date: December 31, 2020VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: December 10, 2020CASE FEES PAID: $561.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3773491
Date: December 10, 2020NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19492 PAGE 770-770
Date: December 10, 2020COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE (VERIFIED)
Date: December 10, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO -REMARKS: NOV | |
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3773491 | |
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIPT NUMBER 3773491 HAD A REFUND OF $140.00 AMOUNT SENT TO MCCABE, WEISBERG & CONWAY, LLC | |
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIPT NUMBER 3773491 REVISED | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19577 PAGE 1639-1640 | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM ; DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING - PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING - PROPOSED FORECLOSURE ORDER | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL SEAN BELMUDEZ FOR WILMINGTON TRUST | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FORECLOSURE DIVISION ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO.9 - BY PLFT.- COPY OF NOTICE PROVIDED TO ALL ON SERVICE LIST | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY -UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KENNETH KNIGHT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.