Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Shapells Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Jimenez, Tomas Agustin Jr, against Luke Atwell, represented by Ellis, Robert Henry, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with FELTEL JR, GILBERT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 21, 2020 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness Division: Cv-H |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
This complaint is filed by Shapell's, Inc., a Florida corporation, against Luke Atwell. Shapell's is in the business of repairing, restoring, and customizing classic vehicles. The complaint alleges that in March 2015, Shapell's and Atwell entered int...
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL (JOINT) WITH PREJUDICE
Date: October 14, 2022NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Date: November 05, 2021NOTICE OF PROPOSED DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE
Date: September 10, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFTS) TO PLTF/
Date: October 21, 2020REQUEST TO PRODUCE FROM DEFENDANT (PLAINTIFF FIRST)
Date: October 06, 2020NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 13, 2020AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM (DEFENDANT'S)
Date: June 09, 2020MOTION TO DISMISS BY PLTF
Date: May 28, 2020REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFTS FIRST) OF DOCS FROM PLTF
Date: June 02, 2020CASE FEES PAID: $395.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3662973
Date: May 08, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ROBERT ELLIS FOR LUKE ATWELL
Date: May 08, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL TOMAS JIMENEZ JR. FOR SHAPELLS INC
Date: April 22, 2020ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM FILED BY DEFT., LUKE ATWELL
Date: May 08, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL
Date: April 21, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON LUKE ATWELL 04/25/2020
Date: May 01, 2020CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3655449
Date: April 21, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: April 21, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL (JOINT) WITH PREJUDICE | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROPOSED DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AND ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE 11/10/2022 @1100AM RM712 | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROPOSED DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFTS) TO PLTF/ | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE FROM DEFENDANT (PLAINTIFF FIRST) | |
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE BY DEFT | |
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM | |
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM (DEFENDANT'S) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.