Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lauro Mendez, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Farah, Dalya Khulood, against Irikefe Odjegba, Rukevwe Odjegba, represented by Hanratty, James Patrick, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with Roberson, Eric presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 20, 2020 |
CategoryAuto Negligence Case Division: Cv-H |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFT IRIKEFE ODJEGBA AMENDED) TO PLTFS/ | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT IRIKEFE ODJEGBA'S) | |
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF-8-13-20 @1:00PM VIA ZOOM | |
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF IRIKEFE OGJEGHA ON 08/13/2020 @ 03:30 P.M. VIA ZOOM- VIDEOCONFERENCE | |
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (DEF. TO PLAINTIFF) | |
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT IRIKEFE ODJEGBA) | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL OF IRIKEFE ODJEGBA | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ON BEHALF OF RUKEVWE ODJEGBA | |
April 22, 2020 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.