Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
John Valis, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Marrese, Michael David, against Christine Hitchcock, Usaa Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Carlson, Kathleen, Eza, Paul Michael, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with DEES, ROBERT M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 06, 2020 |
CategoryAuto Negligence Case Division: Cv-C |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
This complaint is a legal document filed by John Valis against Christine Hitchcock and USAA Casualty Insurance Company. The complaint alleges that on August 16, 2017, Christine Hitchcock struck the rear of John Valis' motor vehicle, causing him serio...
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PLTF
Date: June 15, 2022DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE -COMPLETELY SETTLED
Date: June 01, 2022RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)
Date: May 05, 2022NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S)
Date: May 05, 2022MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY -DEFT
Date: May 03, 2022NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 5/19/22 AT 1:30PM VIA ZOOM
Date: March 11, 2022NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT (DEFT ANNE CHRISTINE HITCHCOCK) TO PLTF
Date: March 17, 2022REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT) OF EXPERT DOCUMENTS TO PLTF
Date: March 08, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES EXPERT/ TO PLTF
Date: March 08, 2022DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES (DEFT CHRISTINE HITCHCOCK'S)
Date: February 28, 2022DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES (DEFT WILLIAM OLIVER CHAMP, JR'S AMENDED)
Date: February 28, 2022REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT CHRISTINE HITCHCOCK) TO DEFT USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE CO
Date: January 07, 2022EXPERT WITNESS LIST (PLTFS DISCLOSURE) AND TREATING PHYSICIANS
Date: January 28, 2022NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY (DEFENDANT'S)
Date: January 28, 2022NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Date: November 05, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY (DEFT) OF DOCUMENTS/
Date: October 25, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT (DEFENDANT'S)
Date: September 24, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL KATHLEEN CARLSON FOR USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: March 05, 2021ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: November 17, 2020MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: September 03, 2020CASE FEES PAID: $20.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3656470
Date: April 22, 2020REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFT CHRISTINE HITCHCOCK (PLTFF'S AMENDED)
Date: April 22, 2020CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3649923
Date: April 06, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: April 07, 2020REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT CHRISTINE HITCHCOCK (PLTFF'S)
Date: April 22, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | > CANCEL REASON - DISMISSED | |
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | CANCELLED JURY TRIAL ON 7/11/2022 9:30:00 AM | |
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PLTF | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE -COMPLETELY SETTLED | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S) | |
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY -DEFT | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (DEFT'S) DUCES TECUM OF DR. MARK FRISK OM 05/27/22 @ 3:30PM VIA ZOOM | |
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (DEFT'S) DUCES TECUM OF DR. TIM OSBORN ON 05/25/22 @ 1:00P.M ZOOM | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT (DEFT ANNE CHRISTINE HITCHCOCK) TO PLTF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.