Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Selah Grace Properties, Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Oughton, Preston Hall, against Eddie Mills, Life Through The Word Ministry International, Inc, Little Christian Home Society, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with AHO, MARIANNE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 22, 2020 |
CategoryOther Real Property Actions $0 - $50,000 Division: Cv-F |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
This complaint was filed by Selah Grace Properties, LLC against Life Through the Word Ministry International, ING, Little Christian Home Society, and Eddie Mills. Selah Grace Properties is a Florida foreign limited liability company, while Life Throu...
CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3809279
Date: February 10, 2021NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Date: November 05, 2021FINAL JUDGMENT / DEFAULT JUDGMENT BOOK 19997 PAGE 899-901
Date: November 04, 2021MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: October 19, 2021PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: March 10, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: October 22, 2020NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED
Date: January 29, 2021CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3741512
Date: October 22, 2020VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: October 22, 2020NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19426 PAGE 971-972
Date: October 22, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT / DEFAULT JUDGMENT BOOK 19997 PAGE 899-901 | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT | |
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFAULT AGAINST LIFE THROUGH THE WORD MINISTRY INTERNATIONAL, INC. A FLORIDA NOT-FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION; LITTLE CHRISTIAN HOME SOCIETY, AN UNICORPORATED PRIVATE CEMETERY; EDDIE MILLS, AN INDIVIDUAL | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT ; LIFE THROUGH THE WORD MINISTRY INTERNATIONAL, INC. A FLORIDA NOT-FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION; LITTLE CHRISTIAN HOME SOCIETY, AN UNICORPORATED PRIVATE CEMETERY; EDDIE MILLS, AN INDIVIDUAL OTHER | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT -EDDIE MILLS | |
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF ACTION | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3809279 | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED ; LIFE THROUGH THE WORD MINISTRY INTERNATIONAL, INC, 3 FLORIDA NOT-FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION; LITTLE CHRISTIAN HOME SOCIETY, AN UNINCORPORATED PRIVATE CEMETERY; EDDIE MILLS, AN INDIVIDUAL; ALL PARTIES CLAIMING INTERESTS BY, THROUGH, UNDER OR AGAINST DEFENDANTS; AND ALL PARTIES HAVING OR CLAIMING TO HAVE ANY RIGHT, TITLE OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY HEREIN DESCRIBED YOU ARE NOTIFIED OF THE INSTITUTION OF THIS ACTION TO QUIET TITLE BY PLAINTIFF AGAINST YOU SEEKING ADVERSE CLAIMS TO THE PROPERTY LOCATED IN JACKSONVILLE, DUVAL COUNTY, FLORIDA | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY ; LIFE THROUGH THE WORD MINISTRY INTERNATIONAL, INC, 3 FLORIDA NOT-FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION; LITTLE CHRISTIAN HOME SOCIETY, AN UNINCORPORATED PRIVATE CEMETERY; EDDIE MILLS, AN INDIVIDUAL; ALL PARTIES CLAIMING INTERESTS BY, THROUGH, UNDER OR AGAINST DEFENDANTS; AND ALL PARTIES HAVING OR CLAIMING TO HAVE ANY RIGHT, TITLE OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY HEREIN DESCRIBED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.