Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Anthony Conrad Beeks, filed a(n) case against Baptist Minister'S Conference Of Duval And Adjacent Counties, Darien K Bolden, Sr, Disciples Of Christ Christian Fellowship Missionary Baptist Church, Edward Norman Jr, Emanuel Missionary Baptist Church, (total of 29) See All represented by Bivens, Burnice, Jean-Bart, Leslie Scott, Peoples-Waters, Rhonda Denise, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with Roberson, Eric presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRoberson, Eric Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2019 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DISTRICT COURT (FEE OUTSTANDING) BOOK 19366 PAGE 312-314
Date: September 10, 2020NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DISTRICT COURT (FEE OUTSTANDING) - DUPLICATE
Date: September 10, 2020MOTION TO DISMISS (AMENDED) WITH PREJUDICE
Date: April 03, 2020ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: August 12, 2020ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION
Date: February 18, 2020RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS - PLTF.
Date: February 05, 2020MOTION TO DISMISS (PLTF) (COMPLAINT) - (DEFT) PLANT VOGTLE WAYNESBORO GEORGIA/ATTYS
Date: January 27, 2020ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFT.)
Date: January 22, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL RHONDA PEOPLES-WATERS FOR PLANT VOGTLE WAYNESBORO, GEORGIA
Date: January 21, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE REV. EDWARD NORMAN SR 01/13/2020 11:50 AM
Date: January 21, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE QUOVADIS THOMAS 01/04/2020 12:45 PM
Date: January 15, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE REV. JAMES MERRITT 01/06/2020 11:22 AM
Date: January 15, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE REV. EDWARD NORMAN JR 01/06/2020 11:10 A,
Date: January 15, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE REV. ROBERT LECOUNT 01/07/2020 9:10 AM
Date: January 15, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE JONATHAN BLACKBURN 01/07/2020 3:15 PM
Date: January 15, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE REV. CHARLES COOPER JR 01/08/2020 2:30 PM
Date: January 15, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE REV. JAMES SAMPSON 01/08/2020 2:30 PM
Date: January 15, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED TO: PLANT VOGTLE
Date: December 31, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: December 30, 2019CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY
Date: December 30, 2019APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS
Date: December 27, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | DCA ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL ; 1D20-2683 | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | DCA ORDER DIRECTING APPELLANT TO FILE COPIES OF THE ORDER(S) FROM WHICH THE APPEAL IS BEING TAKEN; 1D20-2683 | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | DCA ACKNOWLEDGMENT RECEIPT ; 1D20-2683 | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | DCA ORDER DIRECTING APPELLANT TO PAY FILING FEE OR FILE AN ORDER OF INSOLVENCY; 1D20-2683 | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | RECORD OF APPEAL - NON-PAYMENT OF FILING FEE LETTER ; 1D20-2683 | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DISTRICT COURT (FEE OUTSTANDING) BOOK 19366 PAGE 312-314 | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DISTRICT COURT (FEE OUTSTANDING) - DUPLICATE | |
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
April 03, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS (AMENDED) WITH PREJUDICE | |
April 03, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 08-12-20, 11:15 AM, RM 712 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.