Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Patricia Mcgael, filed a(n) case represented by Roach, Matthew Todd, against Bezoda, Llc, Hardee'S Restaurants, Llc, Phase Three Strar, Llc, represented by Austin, Amber Jacquise, Eichhorn, Charles Gerard Jr, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with Roberson, Eric presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 08, 2019 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: June 22, 2021VERDICT- IN FAVOR OF THE DEFENDANT
Date: June 02, 2021CLERKS MEMORANDUM OF TRIAL
Date: June 02, 2021EXHIBIT : COURT'S - # B OTHER - JUROR QUESTION ASKED AND ANSWERED
Date: June 01, 2021ORDER ON UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CORRECT CASE STYLE
Date: June 01, 2021ORDER DENYING DEFTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: May 28, 2021NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND VERDICT FORM
Date: May 27, 2021NOTICE OF FILING JURY INSTRUCTIONS (PLAINTIFF'S)
Date: May 25, 2021NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (DEFENDANTS')
Date: May 25, 2021STIPULATION ( JOINT PRE-TRIAL ) BY ALL PARTIES
Date: May 24, 2021WITNESS LIST ( DEFENDANTS' AMENDED TRIAL )
Date: May 24, 2021WITNESS LIST (PLTF'S TRIAL)
Date: May 23, 2021DEPOSITION OF H. THOMAS BAKER
Date: May 23, 2021OBJECTION (PLTF) TO DEFT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: May 23, 2021DEPOSITION
Date: May 21, 2021MOTION (DEFENDANTS') FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: May 21, 2021RESPONSE TO /IN OPPOSITION OF AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 21, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL MATTHEW ROACH FOR PATRICIA MCGAEL
Date: May 11, 2021NOTICE (PLTFS AMANDED) OF EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFT'S MSJ
Date: May 07, 2021MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DEFTS AMENDED) AND MEMO OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF
Date: April 30, 2021ANSWER ( DEFENDANT, PHASE THREE STAR, LLC'S ) TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: April 23, 2021MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT --DEFT'S
Date: March 18, 2021DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES (DEFTS)
Date: March 10, 2021WITNESS LIST (PLTFS TREATING DOCTORS AND NON-RETAINED EXPERT)
Date: February 08, 2021DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES (PLTFS)
Date: February 08, 2021WITNESS LIST (DEFTS TRIAL) DISCLOSURE
Date: January 25, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT PHASE THREE STAR LLCS) FIRST/ TO PLTF
Date: November 05, 2019CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3498141
Date: August 08, 2019AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST)
Date: August 08, 2019MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY THE CLERK AGAINST DEFT. BEZODA. LLC (PLTF.)
Date: June 13, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: May 08, 2019CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3435215
Date: May 09, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFT'S AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - GRANTED AS TO BEZODA LLC. DENIED AS TO COUNTS II, IV, VI OF PLTF AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | VERDICT- IN FAVOR OF THE DEFENDANT | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERKS MEMORANDUM OF TRIAL | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | EVIDENCE CHANGE OF CUSTODY | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK'S EXHIBIT MEMORANDUM (JOINT) | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT : COURT'S - # D OTHER - JUROR QUESTION ASKED AND ANSWERED | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT : COURT'S - # C OTHER - JUROR QUESTION ASKED AND ANSWERED | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT : JOINT - # 34 PICTURES - COMPOSITE: SURGICAL PHOTOS | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT : JOINT - # 32 OTHER - FLORIDA DOT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.