Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Stern, Dana Michelle, against David J Howard, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with Anderson Jr, Bruce R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnderson Jr, Bruce R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness Division: Cv-E |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ADOPTING STIP AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT IN FULL | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING AMENDED/ ON MAY 12 2021 @ 10;00 AM B/F THE HON. BRUCE R ANDERSON JR | |
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 5-12-21 @ 10 AM | |
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - PLTF. | |
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER FROM DAVID J HOWARD | |
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - DAVID HOWARD - 02/08/20 4:29PM | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3587001 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.