Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Betty Bishop, Tammy Kethman Meuse, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Rothstein, Simon Donald, against Jimmie Edward Turner, represented by Mannion, Sarah Ann, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with BLAZS, KEVIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryOther Real Property Actions $0 - $50,000 Division: Cv-H |
Last RefreshedApril 05, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 18395 PAGE 687-688 | |
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL SARAH MANNION FOR JIMMIE TURNER AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE JIMMIE EDWARD TURNER AKA JIMMIE E. TURNER (SUB SERVICE MRS. JIMMIE TURNER AS WIFE) 1-8-18 @3:59PM | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3094284 | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | OTHER REAL PROPERTY ACTIONS $0 - $50,000 | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED -JIMMIE EDWARD TURNER | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 18244 PAGE 1507-1508 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.