Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sarah Miller, filed a(n) case represented by Conner, Tara Beth, Fratello, Frank Jr, against Ali Kasraeian, represented by Carlson, Kathleen, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts with NORTON, VIRGINIA B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Sarah Miller against Ali Kasraeian in the Circuit Court, Fourth Judicial Circuit, in and for Duval County, Florida. The complaint alleges that on March 30, 2016, Ali Kasraeian negligently operated his 2015 BMW, causing a co...
COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: December 29, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | > CANCEL REASON - DISMISSED | |
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | CANCELLED JURY TRIAL ON 11/18/2019 9:00:00 AM | |
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE THE CASE COMPLETELY SETTLED | |
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES (DEFT) | |
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 9/13/19 @ 1:30PM MEDIATOR G. MICHAEL BURNETT ESQUIRE AT NORTH FLA MEDIATION CENTER JACKSONVILLE FLA | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTFS) TO DEFTS SUPPLEMENTAL/ | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLTF) TO DEFT/ | |
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event | DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES (DEFT'S AMENDED) | |
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION TO SUBPOENA(S) (DEFT'S) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.