Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Chappelle Bronson, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Fratello, Frank Jr, against Florida Farm Bureau General Insurance Co., in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with BLAZS, KEVIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryAuto Negligence Case Division: Cv-H |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2019 | Docket Event | > CANCEL REASON - DISMISSAL | |
July 12, 2019 | Docket Event | CANCELLED JURY TRIAL ON 7/22/2019 9:00:00 AM | |
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE /ATTY FOR PLTF | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT THIS CASE WAS SETTLED. | |
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES (DEFT) TO PLTF / DAED 11/20/2018 | |
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY AT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED 12/19/18 @ 1:30PM/COUNSEL FOR DEFT | |
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES (PLTF'S)/ATTYS FOR DEFT | |
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES (PLTF) | |
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION -DEFT AND ATTY | |
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -DEFT AND ATTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.