Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Daniale Jordan, filed a(n) case represented by Cozart, Rebecca Hopper, Sholes, Ronald E, Stackhouse, Michael Bradford, Torrey, Bradly James, against Jacksonville Transportation Authority, represented by Young, Gabriella, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with AHO, MARIANNE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
This complaint is filed by Plaintiff Daniele Jordan against Defendant Jacksonville Transportation Authority. The Plaintiff is seeking damages in excess of $15,000, excluding attorneys' fees, costs, and interest. The Plaintiff alleges that they were a...
ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Date: July 30, 2021ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL
Date: June 09, 2020MOTION TO WITHDRAW - PLTF
Date: December 26, 2019NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT PLTF TO DEFT JACKSONVILLE TRANS AUTH
Date: October 16, 2019REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFT
Date: August 19, 2019NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFT (PLTFF'S)
Date: January 18, 2019RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S 2ND)/ATTYS FOR DEFT
Date: September 06, 2018NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL MICHAEL STACKHOUSE FOR DANIALE JORDAN
Date: July 14, 2018REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: February 09, 2018RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS (DEFT'S)/ATTY FOR PLTF
Date: March 12, 2018CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3089313
Date: December 29, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: December 29, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION ISSUED | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR 07/28/2021 9:00 AM REMOTE ZOOM MEETING ID 3660559515 | |
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER TO JUDGE FROM PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL | |
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL | |
April 21, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING - 05/27/20 12PM - ROOM 744 | |
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING : ON 03-04-20 @ 10:45 AM, HEARING RM 744 | |
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW - PLTF | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT PLTF TO DEFT JACKSONVILLE TRANS AUTH | |
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE JTA'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.