Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Richard William Bringman, Vicki J Bringman, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Waters, James Floyd Iii, against Rosemary Lou-Ann Scully, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with BLAZS, KEVIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryAuto Negligence Case Division: Cv-H |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
SUMMONS ISSUED - ROSEMARY LOU-ANN SCULLY
Date: December 29, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE -PLTFS | |
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL (PLTF) JURY/ HEARING ON 11/14/2018 @ 930AM | |
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE OF DOCUMENTS TO PLTF VICKI J. BRINGMAN/ATTYS FOR DEFT | |
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF VICKI J. BRINGMAN/ATTYS FOR DEFT | |
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES (MEDICARE) TO PLTF VICKI J. BRINGMAN/ATTYS FOR DEFT | |
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES (CONSORTIUM) TO PLTF RICHARD WILLIAM BRINGMAN/ATTYS FOR DEFT | |
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA -WAIVED (DEFT'S) | |
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA ON NON-PARTIES (DEFT.'S) | |
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFT. (PLTF.'S, RICHARD WILLIAM BRINGMAN AND VICKI J. BRINGMAN) | |
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PLTF. RESPONSE TO INTERROGATORIES/PLTF. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.