Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Lee, Jessica Anne, against City Of Jacksonville, Paul H Beech, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, Unknown Spouse Of Paul H. Beech, Unknown Tenant #1, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Foreclosure - $50,001 - $249,999 Division: Fc-G |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
CASE FEES PAID: $85,120.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3014662
Date: September 07, 2017CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO BRS BETTER NEIGHBORHOODS, INC. OR BK 18125 PG 1674
Date: September 21, 2017AUCTION RESULTS
Date: September 07, 2017FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE 09/07/2017 11:00 AM BOOK 18004 PAGE 2038-2042
Date: May 31, 2017FINAL DISPOSITION FORM ; DISPOSED BY JUDGE
Date: May 31, 2017NOTICE OF SALE 09/07/2017 11:00 AM
Date: June 22, 2017AFFIDAVIT OF INABILITY TO DETERMINE MILITARY STATUS FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PAUL BEECH
Date: March 16, 2017AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS
Date: May 16, 2017MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: April 27, 2017SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON CITY OF JACKSONVILLE 2-2-17 @ 2:08PM
Date: March 16, 2017VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: December 30, 2016NOTICE OF FILING RETURNS OF SERVICE
Date: March 16, 2017NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY -UNKNOWN TENANT #1 AND UNKNOWN TENANT #2
Date: March 16, 2017NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT -PAUL BEECH
Date: March 16, 2017NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 17, 2017ANSWER OF DEFENDANT CITY OF JACKSONVILLE
Date: February 21, 2017CASE FEES PAID: $1,108.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 2833858
Date: January 13, 2017SUMMONS ISSUED ; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PAUL H. BEECH
Date: December 30, 2016SUMMONS ISSUED ; SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Date: December 30, 2016SUMMONS ISSUED ; UNKNOWN TENANT #1
Date: December 30, 2016SUMMONS ISSUED ; PAUL H. BEECH
Date: December 30, 2016VERIFICATION FORM
Date: December 30, 2016SUMMONS ISSUED ; UNKNOWN TENANT #2
Date: December 30, 2016SUMMONS ISSUED ; CITY OF JACKSONVILLE
Date: December 30, 2016NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING
Date: December 30, 2016NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 17844 PAGE 2302-2302
Date: December 30, 2016COMPLAINT (VERIFIED)
Date: December 30, 2016CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE AND ORIGINAL AMENDED AND RESTATED NOTE
Date: December 30, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS DISBURSE $88,200.00 TO: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.C/O STOREY LAW GROUP3670 MAGUIRE BLVD., STE. 200ORLANDO, FL 32803 (BAL 0.00) | |
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO BRS BETTER NEIGHBORHOODS, INC. OR BK 18125 PG 1674 | |
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $85,120.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3014662 | |
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER A DEPOSIT OF $4,410.00 WAS AUTOMATICALLY TAKEN FROM REAL AUCTION BIDDER 29793'S ACCOUNT. THIRD PARTY PURCHASER COMPLETED PAYMENT BY USING THE FUNDS IN HIS ACCOUNT. FUNDS ARE BROKEN UP AS FOLLOWS: REMAINING BALANCE OF AUCTION PD: $83,790.00; CLERK'S FEES OF AUCTION PD: $1,330.50 PD | |
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE BRS BETTER NEIGHBORHOODS INC B# 29793 BID AMOUNT $ 88200.00 BOOK 18116 PAGE 409-410 | |
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event | AUCTION RESULTS | |
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 09/07/2017 11:00 AM | |
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | UNABLE TO ISSUE NOTICE OF SALE-NONE RECEIVED WITH JUDGMENT | |
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event | FILED IN BOX # 140 (LOAN DOCUMENTS) | |
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE 09/07/2017 11:00 AM BOOK 18004 PAGE 2038-2042 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.