Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Mclean, Olen, Scolaro, Timothy Robert, against Edwin M Bridges, Herons Landing Condominium Association Of Jacksonv, Unknown Spouse Of Edwin M Bridges, represented by Sweeting, Chad Marshall, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryNon-Homestead Residential Foreclosure $50,001 - $249,999 Division: Fc-E |
Last RefreshedApril 05, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: December 30, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | RECEIPT NUMBER 2825988 HAD A REFUND OF $140.00 AMOUNT SENT TO ROBERTSON, ANSCHUTZ & SCHNEID, P.L. | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | RECEIPT NUMBER 2825988 REVISED | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND CANCELS THE NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 18302 PAGE 2453-2454 | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $936.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 2825988 | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM -OTHER BEFORE HEARING | |
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE NON-JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED ON 06/22/2017 AND TO STAY THE CASE PURSUANT TO THE SERVICEMEMBERS CIVIL RELIEF ACT | |
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE NON-JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED ON 6-22-2017 AND TO STAY THE CASE PURSUANT TO THE SERVICEMEMBERS CIVIL RELIEF ACT - CASE IS CLOSED AS INACTIVE | |
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STRIKE NON-JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR JUNE 22, 2017 AND STAY THE CASE PURSUANT TO THE SERVICEMEMBERS CIVIL RELIEF ACT (PLAINTIFF'S) | |
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF EDWIN M BRIDGES NKA KELLY BRIDGES | |
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES DEFENDANT EDWIN BRIDGES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.