Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Giacinto, Christopher, against Community Association Of Sandy Pointe, Inc., Gloria Jean Pressley, Leonard C. Pressley, Unknown Parties In Possession # 1, Unknown Parties In Possession # 2, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryNon-Homestead Residential Foreclosure $50,001 - $249,999 Division: Fc-F |
Last RefreshedApril 05, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 17875 PAGE 2441-2442 | |
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event | CANCELLED CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ON 3/14/2017 9:00:00 AM | |
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event | RECEIPT NUMBER 2825995 HAD A REFUND OF $140.00 AMOUNT SENT TO SHAPIRO, FISHMAN & GACHE, LLP | |
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event | RECEIPT NUMBER 2825995 REVISED | |
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM ; DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING - PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT | |
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event | > CANCEL REASON - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ENTERED | |
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $956.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 2825995 | |
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE -COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION OF SANDY POINT, INC, LILLIE BLACKSHEAR, REGISTERED AGENT, 01/14/2017, 6:30PM | |
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE -GLORIA JEAN PRESSLEY AKA GLORIA PRESSLEY 1-14-2017@513PM | |
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE -LEONARD C PRESSLEY AKA LEONARD PRESSLEY 1-14-2017@513PM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.