Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Charles William Pearman Iii, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Malin, Scott Hunter, against Shari Martin, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with COLE, KAREN K presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryOther Real Property Actions $0 - $50,000 Division: Cv-B |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
This complaint is filed by Charles William Pearman, III against Shari Martin in the Circuit Court, Fourth Judicial Circuit, in and for Duval County, Florida. Pearman is a resident of Jacksonville, Duval County, Florida, and Martin is also a resident ...
COMPLAINT
Date: December 30, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION BOOK 17895 PAGE 1854-1855 | |
February 20, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE HEEKIN LITIGATION GROUP | |
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION/ATTY FOR PLTF | |
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT -SHARI MARTIN | |
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFAULT AGAINST SHARI MARTIN | |
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON SHARI MARTIN 1/17/17 AT 4:01PM | |
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING RETUN OF SERVICE | |
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 2825890 | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED SHARI MARTIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.