Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capitol Materials Of Savannah, Inc., filed a(n) case represented by Birr, James Otto Iii, against Turner Construction Company, Topgolf Usa Jacksonville, Llc, Above All Ceilings, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts with BLAZS, KEVIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 31, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AGAINST ABOVE ALL CEILINGS,INC. TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANMY, TOPGOLF USA JACKSONVILLE,LLC, W/O PREJUDICE. | |
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 01/11/2017 AT 2:20 PM TO TOPGOLF USA JACKSONVILLE LLC CT CORPORATION SYSTEM RA | |
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (PLAINTIFF'S) | |
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 01/11/2017 AT 2:20 PM TO TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY CT CORPORATION SYSTEM RA | |
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 01/12/2017 AT 11;38 AM TO ABOVE ALL CEILIGNS, INC TONI BOSSE, RA | |
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 2825652 | |
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | TRANSFER TO DIV. CV-H (CIRCUIT) | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO TOPGOLF USA JACKSONVILLE LLC | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.