Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Betty Sims, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Gaulden, Frank Hewitt, Roach, Matthew Todd, Stevens, Justin Lee, against Crossroads Square Limited Partnership, Dolgencorp, Llc, D B A Dollar General, represented by Folmar, Hayley Lewis, Herro, Joseph Kahlil, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with WILKINSON, GARY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryOther Negligence-Premises Liability-Commercial Division: Cv-G |
Last RefreshedApril 05, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
SUMMONS ISSUED -CROSSROADS SQUARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Date: December 30, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION - ATTYS FOR DEFT. | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( DEFENDANT, DOLGENCORP, LLC'S AMENDED ) TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER (AGRED) ON DEFT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - GRANTED | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF GIL SPRUANCE, ON JUNE 21 2021 @ 01;00 PM VIA ZOOM | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT OF MEDIATOR -NO AGREEMENT REACHED, IMPASSE | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY (DEFT DOLGENCORP LLCS NOTICE OF MEDIATION ATTENDANCE AND) | |
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE (SECOND AMENDED) OF CURTIS HUTCHENS ON 04/14/2021 @100PM VIA ZOOM | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ON APRIL 26 2021 @ 11;30 AM HEARING ROOM 745 B/F THE HON. GARY L WILKINSON VIA ZOOM. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.