Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dominique A Savior, filed a(n) case represented by Sholes, Ronald E, against Jorge E Rodriguez Diaz, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts with BLAZS, KEVIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (PLTF.'S) | |
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION ISSUED | |
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR 10/16/2018 01:45 PM RM 609 | |
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA TO EMAS SPINE AND BRIAN SPECIALIST ET AL 03/27/2017 | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO JORGE ENRIQUE RODRIGUEZ DIAZ | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 2825315 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.