Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of New York Mellon Fka The Bank Of New York A, filed a(n) case represented by Guberman, Jacqueline Costoya, against Heather C Glasgow, Unknown Tenant 1, Unknown Tenant 2, W Emmett Glasgow, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts with FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event | RECEIPT NUMBER 2824889 HAD A REFUND OF $140.00 AMOUNT SENT TO ADAM R BARNETT | |
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $946.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 2824889 | |
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event | RECEIPT NUMBER 2824889 REVISED | |
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND CANCELS THE NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 17972 PAGE 1134-1135 | |
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event | > CANCEL REASON - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF. ON 5-5-17 | |
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM -BEFORE HERING | |
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event | CANCELLED CASE MANAGEMENT RESCHEDULE ON 5/25/2017 9:00:00 AM | |
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 5-25-17 @9:00AM IN ROOM 510 | |
April 21, 2017 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO - CMC SET FOR: 05-25-17 @ 09:00AM IN COURTROOM 510 | |
April 21, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT RESCHEDULE 05/25/2017 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.