Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Doris Earle, filed a(n) case represented by Hooten, Earl Byron Ii, against Deborah Lynn Seyler, represented by Ryan, Jeffrey David, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts with BOYER, TYRIE W. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2016 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
October 05, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL JEFFREY RYAN FOR DEBORAH SEYLER | |
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 10-17-17 @ 1:30PM @ NORTH FLORIDA MEDIATION CENTER | |
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES PLTF, DORIS EARLE | |
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES TO FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.351 (D) PLFT. REQUEST COPIES FROM DEFT. | |
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DEPOSITION, 07/17/2017 10:00AM DEF, DEBORAH L. SEYLER TAKE DEPOSITION OF DORIS EARLE AT US LEGAL SUPPORT | |
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLTF) | |
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF) | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS -PLEADINGS@HOOTENLAW.COM /ATTY FOR PLTF | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH ADMIN ORDER 98-10 /ATTY FOR PLTF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.