Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) case represented by Parker, Amber B, against Gentle Woods Homeowners Association Inc, Reynaldo G Dayao, Carmelita D Dayao, represented by Hall, George Henry Gale, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts with FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2013 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. OR BK 17169 PG 215 | |
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event | CONDUCT SALE-FEE PD-BID BY PLTF-CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND PROOF BID AMT.$ 66,100.00 BOOK 17131 PAGE 1758-1759 | |
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event | AUCTION RESULTS | |
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event | AMENDED/RE NOTICE OF SALE 04/15/2015 11:00 AM | |
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER RESCHEDULING FORECLOSURE SALE DATE RESET FOR 04/15/2015 @ 11:00 AM | |
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE | |
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $50.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 2335240 | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF SALE PER DELORES CALLED ***ORDER TO FOLLOW*** | |
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER CANCELLING FORECLOSURE SALE | |
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 06/18/2014 11AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.