Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) case represented by Hutton, James Wood, Valiathodathil, Princy, against Adam J Brzeczko, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts with FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2015 | Docket Event | REOPEN ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED ADMIN ORDER 2011-02 | |
May 30, 2014 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED NOT SERVED 052214 ADAM J. BRZECKO | |
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED ; SENT TO SHERIFFS OFFICE W/$90 CK #30663 | |
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 2111467 | |
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION TO BE ISSUED | |
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $50.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER | |
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
November 06, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION BOOK 16588 PAGE 1863-1864 | |
October 24, 2013 | Docket Event | CONDUCT SALE-FEE PD-BID BY PLTF-CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND PROOF BID AMT. $103,800.00 BOOK 16572 PAGE 1339-1340 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.