Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Navy Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Fisher, Stacey Samantha, against David A Weeks, El Mariachi Mexican Restaurant, Inc, Martha E Evans, William G Evans Jr, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with COLE, KAREN K presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness Division: Cv-B |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO PLTF.'S MOTION TO DISPOSE OF PROPERTY IN SAFE DEPOSIT BOX (GARNISHEE, VYSTAR CREDIT UNION) | |
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISPOSE OF PROPERTY IN SAFE DEPOSIT BOX/COUNSEL FOR PLTF | |
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT IN GARNISHMENT BOOK 18427 PAGE 2447-2447 | |
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT (EX-PARTE)/PLTF.'S | |
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE EX-PARTE MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT IN GARNISHMENT | |
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF EXTENSION THE WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT SERVED TO GARNISHEE/ATTY FOR PLTF | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING ENTRY INTO SAFE DEPOSIT BOX | |
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO PLTF'S MOTION FOR INSPECTION OF SAFE DEPOSIT BOX WITHOUT HEARING/COUNSEL FOR GARNISHEE, VYSTAR CREDIT UNION | |
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR INSPECTION OF SAFE DEPOSITE BOX WITHOUT HEARING | |
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO DEFENDANT OF SERVING ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.